+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: RC 221-158 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote HJ 21 P. 19
On July 11, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/13/2019 HJ 19 P. 18
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); SJ 21
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: RC 13Y-11N, MA; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; SJ 18
- Sen. Cavanaugh Moved Ought to Pass; 05/30/2019; SJ 18
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: No Recommendation, 05/30/2019; SC 24
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/11/2019, Room 100, SH, 01:45 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; SC 17A
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 12
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/20/2019 HJ 11 P. 9
- Lay on Table (Rep. Flanagan): MF RC 145-212 03/20/2019 HJ 11 P. 9
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-7; RC) HC 16 P. 28
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am LOB 307
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/20/2019 11:00 am LOB 305-307
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services HJ 2 P. 44
+ − Votes (3)
September 18, 2019: Veto Override
- Yeas: 221
- Nays: 158
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 11
May 30, 2019: Ought to Pass
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 24
March 20, 2019: Table
- Yeas: 145
- Nays: 212
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 36
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor