+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 22, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 7/21/2014; Chapter 0231; Effective Date 1/1/2015.
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014)
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 13
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/15/14; SC18
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; SJ 11
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/1/14; SC16
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/22/14, Room 103, LOB, 1:30 p.m.; SC15
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Transportation
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA RC 238-66
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from Consent (Rep. Sylvia)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-0; CC)
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/18/2014 10:30 AM LOB 202 (Time Change)
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 3/6/2014 9:30 AM LOB 202
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 3/6/2014 10:00 AM LOB 202
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Adopt Amendment #2269h (New Title) AA RC 171-120
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #2269h(NT) MA RC 164-127
- Lay on Table (Rep. Vaillancourt) MF RC 126-165
- Referred to Ways and Means
On November 25, 2013 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2269h, NT (Vote 13-5; RC)
On October 10, 2013 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED==Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/7/2013 1:00 PM -Room Change-LOB 305
- ==CANCELLED==Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/6/2013 10:15 AM LOB 305
On October 1, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/8/2013 1:30 PM LOB 305
On September 24, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/1/2013 10:00 AM LOB 305
On August 23, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 10:00 AM LOB 305
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/28/2013 11:30 AM LOB 305
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/12/2013 10:15 AM LOB 305
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2013 9:00 AM LOB 301
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2013 9:00 AM LOB 303
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 10:15 AM LOB 305
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; HJ 12, PG.190
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 26, 2014: OTP
- Yeas: 238
- Nays: 66
January 29, 2014: Adopt 13-2269h
- Yeas: 171
- Nays: 120
January 29, 2014: Table
- Yeas: 126
- Nays: 165
January 29, 2014: OTPA
- Yeas: 164
- Nays: 127