+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA RC 252-100; HJ 26, PG.787-790
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Special Order to Mar 13 Without Objection; HJ 24, PG.703
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; HC 22, PG.519
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 14-1; Part I, RC); HC 22, PG.519
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 AM LOB 203
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 11:00 AM LOB 203
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Transportation; HJ 12, PG.190
+ − Vote
March 13, 2013: ITL
- Yeas: 252
- Nays: 100