+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 24, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 05/19/2023; Chapter 41; Eff: 07/18/2023
On May 17, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 05/04/2023
On May 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/11/2023); SJ 15
On April 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/13/2023; SJ 13
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/13/2023; SC 17
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/28/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:35 am; SC 15
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/16/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 11
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/16/2023 HJ 9 P. 4
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/28/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 16 P. 4
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/28/2023 02:30 pm LOB 206-208
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/07/2023 03:00 pm LOB 306-308
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Election Law HJ 3 P. 9