+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 12, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/30/2023; Chapter 126; 08/29/2023 HJ 17
On June 20, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 14
On June 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/15/2023); SJ 20
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
On April 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 21
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/04/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 16
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/16/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 11
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0645h: AA VV 03/16/2023 HJ 9 P. 7
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0645h: MA VV 03/16/2023 HJ 9 P. 7
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0645h (NT) 03/08/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 15 P. 5
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 01:30 pm LOB 306-308
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/16/2023 01:45 pm LOB 306-308
- Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2023-0320h: 02/16/2023 01:50 pm LOB 306-308
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 3 P. 9