+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 7, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 10:00 am LOB 201-203 HC 36
On May 17, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 06/07/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 206-208
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/09/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 01:00 pm LOB 206-208
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary HJ 3 P. 9