+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 20, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/14/2024; Chapter 46; eff. 1/1/2025 HJ 16
On June 10, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 36
On June 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/30/2024); SJ 17
On April 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/02/2024; SJ 11
On April 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 17
On March 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 100, SH, 10:30 am; SC 13
On February 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/15/2024 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 5
On January 4, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-2441h: AA VV 01/04/2024 HJ 2 P. 17
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2441h: MA VV 01/04/2024 HJ 2 P. 18
On November 15, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2441h (NT) 11/08/2023 (Vote 16-4; RC) HC 49 P. 40
On September 26, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
On September 22, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/15/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
- Full Committee Work Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
On September 7, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 10:00 am LOB 201-203 HC 36
On May 17, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 06/07/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 206-208
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/09/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 01:00 pm LOB 206-208
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary HJ 3 P. 9