+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 3, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/03/2024 HJ 1 P. 54
On November 15, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB282-FN-A 11/15/2023 (Vote 25-0; CC) HC 49 P. 13
On October 17, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/14/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211 HC 42
On September 5, 2023 in the House:
- Division III Work Session: 10/03/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211 HC 36
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/28/2023 09:00 am LOB 210-211
On March 17, 2023 in the House:
- Division Work Session: 03/24/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On March 10, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/15/2023 11:00 am LOB 210-211
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Division III Work Session: 03/14/2023 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Division Work Session: 03/06/2023 02:00 pm LOB 210-211
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0160h: AA VV 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 47
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0160h: MA DV 186-170 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 47
- Referred to Finance 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 47
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0160h 02/15/2023 (Vote 12-8; 12-8) HC 12 P. 13
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/15/2023 01:00 pm LOB 201-203
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2023 01:30 pm LOB 210-211
On January 26, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/02/2023 01:30 pm LOB 210-211
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 02:00 pm LOB 210-211
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 3 P. 9
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor