+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA RC 262-92 01/26/2017 HJ 4 P. 6
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/26/2017 (Vote 14-6; RC)
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/17/2017 01:00 PM LOB 204
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/11/2017 10:00 AM LOB 204
On December 30, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 2 P. 22
+ − Vote
January 26, 2017: ITL
- Yeas: 262
- Nays: 92
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor