+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 12
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/09/2023 10:30 am LOB 301-303
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB273 02/09/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 12 P. 7
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 02:20 pm LOB 301-303
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government HJ 3 P. 9