+ − Actions (3)
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0577h (Vote 21-0; CC) HC 18 P. 22
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/03/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following linkTo join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92220129569 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 9, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development HJ 2 P. 41
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor