+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
On April 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/11/2023; SC 21
On April 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/11/2023, Room 100, SH, 10:00 am; SC 17
On March 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 12
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA DV 193-191 03/23/2023 HJ 11 P. 29
- Reconsider HB26 (Rep. Adjutant): MF DV 190-194 03/23/2023 HJ 11 P. 29
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/08/2023 (Vote ; RC) HC 16 P. 37
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 206-208
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/09/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 11:15 am LOB 206-208
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary HJ 3 P. 8
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor