+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 163; Effective Date 7/1/2015
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of 6/11/2015); HJ 46, PG. 1993
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 6/11/2015); SJ 19
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1267s (Rep Major): MA VV; HJ 44, PG. 1814
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: RC 14Y-7N, MA; OT3rdg; SJ 16
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/28/15; SC23
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1267s, RC 17Y-7N, MA; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; SJ 12
- Committee Amendment 1267s, AA, VV
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1267s, 4/30/15; SC19
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1267s, 4/23/15; SC18
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/7/15, Room 103, LOB, 1:15 p.m.; SC16
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Transportation; SJ 9
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Second Committee Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f); HJ 20, PG. 544
- Referred to Finance
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ 20, PG. 537
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 18 (Vote 13-5; RC); HC13, PG. 251
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Continued Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 11:15 AM LOB 202
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/9/2015 9:30 AM LOB 202=RECESSED=
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 10:00 AM LOB 202=POSTPONED=
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 10:00 AM LOB 202
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; HJ 12, PG. 214
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2015: Ought to Pass
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 7
April 30, 2015: Ought to Pass with Amendment
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor