+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 01/03/2024; SJ 1
On December 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; CC; 01/03/2024; SC 49
On May 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 05/18/2023; SJ 15
On May 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/18/2023; SC 22A
On April 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/11/2023, Room 103, SH, 09:15 am; SC 17
On March 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 12
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0924h: AA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 25
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0924h: MA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 24
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0924h 03/13/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 16 P. 13
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2023 10:30 am LOB 302-304
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 03/02/2023 10:00 am 302-304
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/16/2023 01:00 pm LOB 302-304
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/06/2023 02:30 pm LOB 302-304
- Public Hearing: 02/06/2023 02:30 pm LOB 302-304
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy HJ 2 P. 8