+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2344h for Jan 8 (Vote 12-0; CC)
On October 21, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill- Executive Session: 11/7/2013 1:00 PM LOB 307
On October 1, 2013 in the House:
- ==ROOM CHANGE== Work Session: 10/9/2013 10:00 AM LOB 305
On September 18, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/9/2013 10:00 AM LOB 307
On September 3, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2013 10:00 AM LOB 307
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:30 AM LOB 307
- Subcommittee Work Session: 3/5/2013 10:15 AM LOB 307
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 10:30 AM LOB 104
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/31/2013 2:30 PM LOB 307
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources; HJ 12, PG.189