+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/23/2023 HJ 7 P. 11
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB256 01/30/2023 (Vote 16-4; RC) HC 12 P. 22
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/30/2023 01:00 pm LOB 206-208
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 03:30 pm LOB 206-208
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary HJ 2 P. 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor