+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed By Governor 06/27/2013; Effective 06/27/2013; Chapter 0139
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled [Recess of 6/5/13]; HJ49, PG.1648
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg;
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/23/13; Vote 5-0; CC; SC21
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/20/13, Room 100, SH, 9:50 a.m.; SC12
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin; SJ 7
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ 24, PG.655-656
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 6 (Vote 25-0; CC); HC 20, PG.411
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/14/2013 1:00 PM LOB 210-211
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 2/12/2013 3:00 PM LOB 212
- Referred to Finance; HJ 16, PG.301
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ 16, PG.301
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 6 (Vote 19-0; CC); HC 11, PG.150
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 1/29/2013 1:30 PM LOB 306
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/22/2013 1:00 PM LOB 306
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; HJ 12, PG.189