+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, MA, VV; 06/16/2020 SJ 8
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/17/2020, Room 103, LOB, 09:20 am; SC 11
- Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; SJ 7
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2776h (NT): MA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 36
- Amendment # 2019-2776h (NT): AA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 36
On October 31, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2776h (NT) (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 50
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/23/2019 10:00 am LOB 207
- Subcommittee Work Session: 10/21/2019 10:00 am LOB 207
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2019 10:00 am LOB 207
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am LOB 207
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2019 03:00 pm LOB 207
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2019 10:00 am LOB 207
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 11:15 am LOB 207
On December 27, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education HJ 2 P. 43