+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- II. Remainder Effective 07/01/2013
- I. Section 47 Effective 06/30/2013
- Signed By Governor 07/09/2013; Chapter 0195
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; HJ52, PG.1714
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2189e Adopted; HJ52, PG.1713-1714
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2189e Adopted, VV
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report #2131c Adopted, VV; HJ52, PG.1687
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 2131c; Adopted, VV
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report #2013-2131c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/17/2013 12:30 PM LOB 201
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/13/2013 11:30 AM LOB 201
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Boutin, Rausch, Larsen
- Sen. Boutin Moved Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps Campbell, Cloutier, Irwin, Chandler, and Graham [Recess of 6/5/13]; HJ49, PG.1649
- House Non-Concurs with Senate AM #1640s and Requests C of C (Rep Shurtleff): MA VV [Recess of 6/5/13]; HJ49, PG.1649
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1640s, MA, VV; OT3rdg
- Committee Amendment 1640s, AA, VV
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1640s, 6/6/13; SC23
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/16/13, Room 103, SH, 9:30 a.m.; SC16
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced 3/28/13 and Referred to Capital Budget
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Floor Amendment #2013-1207h (Rep Beaudoin): AF RC 98-253; HJ35, PG.1186-1188
- Amendment #1150h: AA VV; HJ35, PG.1174-1186
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #1150h: MA RC 285-68; HJ35, PG.1188-1190
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1150h; HC 28, PG.945-956
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1150h for April 3 (Vote 19-0; RC); HC 28, PG.904-905
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Continued Executive Session: 3/28/2013 10:00 AM LOB 201
- Executive Session: 3/27/2013 LOB 201 After House Session
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 3/21/2013 2:00 PM LOB 201
- Full Committee Work Session: 3/14/2013 10:00 AM LOB 201
- Public Hearing: 3/19/2013 10:10 AM LOB 201
- Full Committee Work Session: 3/19/2013 4:00 PM LOB 201
- Full Committee Work Session: 3/26/2013 10:15 AM LOB 201
- Continued Public Hearing: 3/22/2013 10:00 AM LOB 201
- Full Committee Work Session: 3/25/2013 10:00 AM LOB 201
- Continued Public Hearing: 3/26/2013 10:00 AM LOB 201
- Executive Session: 3/26/2013 1:00 PM LOB 201
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways; HJ 24, PG.646
- Late Drafting and Introduction Approved by Rules Committee; HJ 24, PG.646
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
April 3, 2013: FLAM 1207H (REP BEAUDOIN)
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 253
April 3, 2013: OTP/AM 1150H
- Yeas: 285
- Nays: 68
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor