+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===;
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/18/13; SC16
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/2/13, Room 100, SH, 10:05 a.m.; SC14
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 8
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ 26, PG.772
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Special Order to Mar 13 Without Objection; HJ 24, PG.703
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 13 (Vote 10-9; Part I, RC); HC 22, PG.514
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 AM LOB 204
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 10:00 AM LOB 204
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; HJ 12, PG.188