+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/06/2016 HJ 4 P. 33
On November 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 20-0; CC); HC 67, PG. 5
On September 9, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 AM LOB 207
On August 13, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/9/2015 10:00 AM LOB 207
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/9/2015 10:00 AM LOB 207
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/26/2015 10:00 AM LOB 207
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/17/2015 10:00 AM LOB 207
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 11:00 AM LOB 207
- ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 2:00 PM LOB 207
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 2:00 PM LOB 207
- ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 11:00 AM LOB 207
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 11:00 AM LOB 207
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Education; HJ 12, PG. 214
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor