+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; SJ 16
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/28/15; Vote 5-0; CC; SC23
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 5/5/15, Room 100, SH, 9:15 a.m.; SC19
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 10
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0618h: MA RC 191-174; HJ 24, PG. 822-825
- Amendment #0618h: AA VV; HJ 24, PG. 822
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0618h for Mar 11 (Vote 11-8; RC); HC19, PG. 412
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 AM LOB 206
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 10:45 AM LOB 206
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Children and Family Law; HJ 12, PG. 214
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 11, 2015: Ought to Pass Amended
- Yeas: 191
- Nays: 174