+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 19, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 05/17/2023; Chapter 31; Eff: 05/17/2023
On May 15, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 05/04/2023
On May 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/11/2023); SJ 15
On April 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/13/2023; SJ 13
On April 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/13/2023; SC 17
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/21/2023, Room 100, SH, 09:30 am; SC 14
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 9
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023--0148h: AA VV 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 10
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023--0148h: MA VV 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 9
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0148h 02/08/2023 (Vote 18-1; CC) HC 12 P. 6
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 206-208
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/09/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 10:30 am LOB 206-208
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary HJ 2 P. 7
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor