+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report, Not Signed Off
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/19/2013 12:00 PM LOB 305
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/18/2013 11:30 AM LOB 305 ==RECESSED==
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Forrester, Woodburn
- Sen. Prescott Moved Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps Chandley, Theberge, Parkhurst, and Shurtleff [Recess of 6/5/13]; HJ49, PG.1650
- House Non-Concurs with Senate AM #1932s(NT) and Requests C of C (Rep Shurtleff): MA VV [Recess of 6/5/13]; HJ49, PG.1650
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1932s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg
- Sen. Forrester Floor Amendment #2013-1932s, AA, VV
- Without Objection, HB 233 is Special Ordered to the end of the Regular Calendar, 2/3 Necessary, MA;
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 6/6/13; SC23
- Without Objection, HB 233 is Special Ordered to the Next Session Day, 2/3 Necessary, MA;
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Without Objection, HB 233 is Special Ordered to the Next Session Day, 2/3 Necessary, MA;
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/30/13; SC22
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/23/13; SC21
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Without Objection, HB 233 is Special Ordered to the Next Session Day, 2/3 necessary, MA;
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/2/13; SC18
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/27/13, Room 101, LOB, 9:30 a.m.; SC13
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced 2/14/2013 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 6
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0137h(NT): MA VV; HJ 21, PG.469-470
- Amendment #0137h(NT): AA VV; HJ 21, PG.469-470
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0137h (New Title); HC 15, PG.293
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0137h(NT) for Feb 20 (Vote 17-0; CC); HC 15, PG.268-269
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/12/2013 10:15 AM LOB 305
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 1/31/2013 11:00 AM LOB 305
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/22/2013 10:15 AM LOB 305
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; HJ 12, PG.188
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor