+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Hassan 05/19/2016; Chapter 72; Eff. 7/18/2016
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/11/2016 HJ 38 P. 46
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/05/2016); SJ 17
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1118s (Reps. Ladd, Kurk): MA VV 04/20/2016 HJ 36 P. 2
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1118s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/31/2016; SJ 11
- Committee Amendment 1118s, AA, VV; 03/31/2016 SJ 11
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1118s, 03/31/2016; SC 12
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/22/2016, Rooms 103, LOB, 09:35 am; SC 11
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/10/2016 and Referred to Education; SJ 9
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 28
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 25-0; CC) HC 14 P. 18
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/04/2016 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment #2015-2509h: AA VV 01/06/2016 HJ 4 P. 90
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2509h: MA DV 198-133 01/06/2016 HJ 4 P. 90
- Referred to Finance 01/06/2016 HJ 4 P. 90
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
On November 12, 2015 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2509h for Jan 6 (Vote 13-7; RC); HC 67, PG. 17
On October 8, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 AM LOB 207
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2015 1:00 PM LOB 207
On September 9, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2015 10:00 AM LOB 207
On August 25, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2015 9:30 AM LOB 207
On August 17, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/25/2015 1:00 PM LOB 207
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/26/2015 1:00 PM LOB 207
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/19/2015 10:00 AM LOB 207
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/5/2015 11:30 AM LOB 207
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/29/2015 10:00 AM LOB 206-208
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Education; HJ 12, PG. 213