+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 15, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 224; Effective Date 1/1/2016
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); HJ 54, PG. 2139
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); SJ 19
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1838s (Reps Hunt, Tholl): MA VV; HJ 46, PG. 1988
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1838s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 16
- Committee Amendment 1838s, NT, AA, VV
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1838s, NT, 5/28/15; Vote 5-0; CC; SC23
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/21/15, Room 100, SH, 1:00 p.m.; SC18
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce; SJ 11
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0966h: MA VV; HJ 28, PG. 1289-1290
- Amendment #0966h: AA VV; HJ 28, PG. 1289-1290
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0966h for Mar 25 (Vote 16-0; CC); HC 23, PG. 632
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 3/17/2015 11:00 AM LOB 204
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ 20, PG. 506
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 18 (Vote 12-7; RC); HC13, PG. 244
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/10/2015 11:30 AM LOB 302
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2015 1:15 PM LOB 302
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- ==CANCELED== Executive Session: 2/3/2015 LOB 302
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 11:00 AM LOB 302
- ==POSTPONED==Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 11:00 AM LOB 302
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; HJ 12, PG. 213
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor