+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/06/2016 HJ 4 P. 47
On November 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 13-0; CC); HC 67, PG. 9
On September 16, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/6/2015 2:00 PM LOB 301
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2015 11:00 AM LOB 301
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 5/5/2015 10:00 AM LOB 301
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Continued Executive Session: 2/17/2015 4:00 PM LOB 301
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2015 11:30 AM LOB 301
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/10/2015 2:00 PM LOB 301 ==RECESSED==
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/10/2015 9:30 AM LOB 301
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 8:30 AM LOB 301
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 10:00 AM LOB 301
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; HJ 12, PG. 213
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor