+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/07/2016 HJ 6 P. 37
On November 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 10-3; RC); HC 67, PG. 25
On September 16, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/6/2015 2:00 PM LOB 301
On September 15, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2015 1:00 PM LOB 301
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2015 10:00 AM LOB 301
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/17/2015 10:30 AM LOB 301
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 10:00 AM LOB 301
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; HJ 12, PG. 213