+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 3
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB218-FN 02/07/2023 (Vote 16-0; CC) HC 12 P. 3
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/07/2023 09:30 am LOB 206-208
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/17/2023 01:30 pm LOB 206-208
On January 3, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor