+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
On April 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/11/2023; SC 21
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/05/2023, Room 101, LOB, 10:00 am; SC 16
On March 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 12
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 17
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/08/2023 (Vote 19-1; CC) HC 16 P. 10
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 201-203
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/16/2023 01:30 pm LOB 201-203
On January 3, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs