+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; CC)
On October 2, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/08/2017 09:30 AM LOB 207
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/14/2017 10:30 AM LOB 207
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/19/2017 09:30 AM LOB 207
- Public Hearing: 01/17/2017 11:20 AM LOB 207
On December 30, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Education HJ 2 P. 20