+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 05/16/2013; Effective 07/15/2013; Chapter 0023
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; HJ38, PG.1257
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg;
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/18/13; Vote 5-0; CC; SC16
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: === ROOM CHANGE === 4/2/13, Room 100, SH, 1:00 p.m.; SC14
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0669h(NT): MA VV; HJ 27, PG.830
- Amendment #0669h(NT): AA VV; HJ 27, PG.830
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0669h (New Title); HC 23 PG.608-609
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0669h(NT) for Mar 20 (Vote 19-1; CC); HC 23 PG.577
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:45 AM LOB 302
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:00 AM LOB 302==RECESSED=
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/7/2013 8:30 AM LOB 302 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 9:00 AM)==
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/23/2013 1:15 PM LOB 302
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; HJ 12, PG.186
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor