+ − Actions (7)
On October 13, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. LOB306-308
On October 6, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2021 09:00 am LOB 301-303
On August 17, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2021 10:30 am LOB 302-304
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/10/2021 01:40 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95521072179
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/02/2021 01:45 pm Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92235067141 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 2 P. 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor