+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/27/2019 HJ 6 P. 14
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 13 P. 10
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm LOB 205
- Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am LOB 205
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 01:15 pm Reps Hall
On December 26, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 2 P. 41
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor