+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 6/5/2015; Chapter 84; Effective Date 8/4/2015
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); HJ 41, PG. 1779
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); SJ 14
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 12
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; SC19
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/23/15; SC18
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/15/15, Room 100, SH, 9:00 a.m.; SC17
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 10
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0606h: MA VV
- Amendment #0606h: AA VV
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0606h (NT) for Mar 11 (Vote 17-1; CC); HC19, PG. 398
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/2/2015 10:00 AM LOB 303
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 1/28/2015 1:00 PM LOB 303
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- ==POSTPONED==Subcommittee Work Session: 1/27/2015 1:00 PM LOB 303
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/20/2015 1:00 PM LOB 303
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Environment and Agriculture; HJ 12, PG. 211