+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 10, 2024 in the House:
- Veto Sustained 10/10/2024: RC 132-195 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote HJ 17 P. 5
On August 6, 2024 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2024 HJ 16
On July 23, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 56
On July 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On June 13, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2024-2241c: Adopted, VV 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 16
On June 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2024-2241c, Adopted, VV; 06/13/2024; SJ 17
On June 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2024-2241c; 06/13/2024
On June 4, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting: 06/04/2024 10:30 am LOB 202-204
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Avard Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
- President Appoints: Senators Pearl, Carson, Watters; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 29, 2024 in the House:
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1822s and 2024-1969s and Requests CofC (Reps. Renzullo, Hill, M. Smith, Shurtleff): MA VV 05/28/2024 HJ 14 P. 178
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1822s, AA, VV; 05/22/2024; SJ 14
- Sen. Pearl Floor Amendment # 2024-1969s, AA, VV; 05/22/2024; SJ 14
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 2024-1822s and 2024-1969s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/22/2024; SJ 14
On May 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 05/16/2024, Without Objection, MA; 05/15/2024 SJ 12
- Special Order to the beginning of the regular calendar next session, Without Objection, MA; 05/16/2024; SJ 13
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1822s, 05/22/2024, Vote 5-0; SC 20
On May 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Pearl Moved to Remove HB 194-FN from the Consent Calendar; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1822s, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 19
On March 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/26/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:30 am; SC 12
On March 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 7
On February 28, 2024 in the House:
- Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 47(f) 02/27/2024 HJ 7 P. 27
On January 9, 2024 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 01/16/2024 10:00 am LOB 212
On January 4, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to Finance 01/03/2024 HJ 1 P. 37
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0037h: MA RC 194-179 01/04/2024 HJ 2 P. 35
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0037h: MA RC 194-179 01/04/2024 HJ 2 P. 35
On November 15, 2023 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0037h (NT) 11/01/2023 (Vote 13-7; RC) HC 49 P. 43
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
On October 11, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 10/18/2023 01:00 pm LOB 306-308 HC 41
- Executive Session: 11/01/2023 10:00 am LOB 306-308 HC 41
On September 28, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 10/11/2023 10:00 am LOB 306-308 HC 39
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2023 10:30 am LOB 305-307
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 10:15 am LOB 305-307
On January 3, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor