+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 6/5/2015; Chapter 83; Effective Date 8/4/2015
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); HJ 41, PG. 1779
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); SJ 14
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 12
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; SC19
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/23/15; SC18
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/24/15, Room 103, SH, 9:30 a.m.; SC14
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; SJ 8
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0363h: MA VV; HJ 22, PG. 563
- Amendment #0363h: AA VV; HJ 22, PG. 563
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0363h for Mar 4 (Vote 18-0; CC); HC18, PG. 348
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/12/2015 12:00 PM LOB 301
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 10:20 AM LOB 301
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 10:20 AM LOB 301
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; HJ 12, PG. 211
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor