+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On August 30, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 10/03/2023 01:00 pm LOB 206-208
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/07/2023 09:30 am LOB 206-208
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/21/2023 02:00 pm LOB 206-208
On January 3, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor