+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 62; Effective Date 8/31/2015
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); HJ 41, PG. 1779
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); SJ 14
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 12
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; CC; SC19
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/16/15, Room 101, LOB, 10:30 a.m.; SC17
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce; SJ 10
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0111h: MA VV; HJ 24, PG. 769-770
- Amendment #0111h: AA VV; HJ 24, PG. 769-770
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0111h for Mar 11 (Vote 20-0; CC); HC19, PG. 391
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Seesion: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM LOB 302
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2015 8:30 AM LOB 302
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/20/2015 11:00 AM LOB 302
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; HJ 12, PG. 211