+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On October 29, 2018 in the House:
- Interim Study Report: Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 7-6)
On October 1, 2018 in the House:
- Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 10/23/2018 09:00 AM LOB306
On September 10, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/23/2018 10:00 AM LOB306
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Refer for Interim Study: MA RC 211-93 03/15/2018 HJ 8 P. 67
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection HJ 7 P. 49
- Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): MA VV by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 125
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-2; RC) HC 9 P. 68
- Executive Session: 02/27/2018 LOB 306
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/27/2018 09:30 AM LOB 308
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2018 01:00 PM LOB 306
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- ==ROOM CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2018 01:30 PM LOB 205
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/06/2018 11:30 AM LOB 306
On December 15, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 1 P. 24
+ − Vote
March 15, 2018: Interim Study
- Yeas: 211
- Nays: 93
- Present/NV: 28
- Absent: 60