+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 21
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-0; CC) HC 9 P. 11
- Executive Session: 02/21/2018 LOB 302
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:00 AM LOB 305
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/14/2018 11:00 AM LOB 302
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/07/2018 11:00 AM LOB 302
On December 14, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 24