+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 29, 2018 in the House:
- Interim Study Report: Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 10-2)
On September 20, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/02/2018 10:00 AM LOB208
On August 10, 2018 in the House:
- Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/18/2018 10:00 AM LOB208
- Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 08/28/2018 10:00 AM LOB208
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Refer for Interim Study: MA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 48
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 16-2; CC) HC 9 P. 27
- Executive Session: 02/27/2018 LOB 208
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/25/2018 02:00 PM LOB 208
On November 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary HJ 1 P. 22
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor