+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 30, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 290; Eff: 09/27/2019
On July 12, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 56
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2642e: AA VV 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 54
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2642e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2229s (Rep. Myler): MA VV 06/13/2019 HJ 19 P. 3
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Order to to the present time, Without Objection, MA; 05/23/2019; SJ 17
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2229s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; SJ 17
- Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2019-2229s, AA, VV; 05/23/2019; SJ 17
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; SC 23
- Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, MA; 05/02/2019; SJ 15
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; SC 22
- Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, MA; 05/15/2019; SJ 16
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; SC 20
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 103, LOB, 09:20 am; SC 16
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; SJ 8
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0191h: MA VV 02/14/2019 HJ 5 P. 6
- Amendment # 2019-0191h: AA VV 02/14/2019 HJ 5 P. 6
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0191h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 11 P. 3
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am LOB 207
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 10:00 am LOB 207
On December 27, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education HJ 2 P. 40