+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 201; Eff. 6/8/2018
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/10/2018
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); SJ 18
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1950e: AA VV 05/10/2018
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1950e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 05/10/2018); SJ 18
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; SJ 15
- Committee Amendment # 2018-1760s, AF, VV; 05/02/2018; SJ 15
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1760s, 05/02/2018; SC 19
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/10/2018, Room 100, SH, 01:00 pm; SC 16
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 7
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0331h: MA VV 02/22/2018 HJ 5 P. 4
- Amendment # 2018-0331h: AA VV 02/22/2018 HJ 5 P. 4
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0331h for 02/22/2018 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 7 P. 5
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/31/2018 LOB 302
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 01:15 PM LOB 302
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 01:15 PM LOB 302
On November 17, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 21
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor