+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 05/30/2019; SJ 18
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; CC; 05/30/2019; SC 24
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/04/2019, Room 101, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 16
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 9
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/27/2019 HJ 6 P. 14
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 19-2; CC) HC 13 P. 10
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am LOB 212
- Executive Session: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm LOB 205
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 01:30 pm LOB 303
On December 27, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 2 P. 40
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor