+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 30, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/26/2024; Chapter 274; eff. 07/26/2024
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On July 3, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2342e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 48
On July 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2342e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 31, 2024 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1732s (Rep. W. MacDonald): MA VV 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 21
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1732s, AA, VV; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1732s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1732s, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 19
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- ==ROOM CHANGE== Hearing: 04/24/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:15 am; SC 16
On March 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 8
On March 21, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/21/2024 HJ 9 P. 8
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/06/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On February 28, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/06/2024 09:30 am LOB 203
- Executive Session: 03/06/2024 10:00 am LOB 203
On February 15, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/08/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 4 P. 47
- Late Drafting and Introduction Approved by House by the Necessary 2/3 MA 02/08/2024 HJ 4 P. 47