+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 8, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 05/04/2023; Chapter 17; eff: 07/03/2023
On May 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 04/13/2023); SJ 14
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 04/06/2023
On April 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/13/2023; SJ 13
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/13/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 17
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/28/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 15
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/16/2023 and Referred to Education; SJ 11
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0316h: AA VV 03/16/2023 HJ 9 P. 39
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0316h: MA DV 199-174 03/16/2023 HJ 9 P. 39
On March 3, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/24/2023 (Vote ; RC) HC 15 P. 12
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/24/2023 09:30 am LOB 205-207
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/03/2023 10:15 am LOB 205-207
On January 5, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/11/2023 02:00 pm LOB 205-207
On January 3, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Education