+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, MA, VV; 06/16/2020; SJ 8
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA RC 172-142 03/05/2020 HJ 6 P. 42
- Lay on Table (Rep. Burt): MF RC 144-185 03/05/2020 HJ 6 P. 42
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): MA VV 02/20/2020
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 12-8; RC) HC 7 P. 37
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm LOB 202
On January 10, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 01:00 pm LOB 202
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Ways and Means HJ 1 P. 32
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor