+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 90; Eff. 7/24/2018
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); SJ 15
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 04/26/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; SJ 13
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; SC 17
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/10/2018, Room 103, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 16
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/22/2018 and Referred to Education; SJ 11
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/21/2018 HJ 9 P. 3
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/21/2018 (Vote 26-0; CC) HC 11 P. 3
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/14/2018 LOB 210-211
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Division II Work Session: 03/14/2018 10:05 AM LOB 209
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Division II Work Session: 03/13/2018 01:00 PM LOB 209
- ==RESCHEDULED== Division II Work Session: 03/09/2018 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/14/2018 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Division II Work Session: 03/08/2018 04:30 PM LOB 212
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Division II Work Session: 02/21/2018 01:30 PM LOB 209
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Finance 02/08/2018 HJ 3 P. 5
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/08/2018 HJ 3 P. 5
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 5 P. 7
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/25/2018 10:00 AM LOB 207
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 02:00 PM LOB 207
On November 15, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education HJ 1 P. 20