+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 26, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024; Chapter 255; eff. 07/19/2024
On July 2, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 47
On July 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 31, 2024 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1614s (Rep. Vose): MA VV 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 23
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1614s, AA, VV; 05/02/2024; SJ 11
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1614s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/02/2024; SJ 11
On April 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1614s, 05/02/2024, Vote 4-0; SC 17
On April 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/09/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:30 am; SC 14
On March 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 6
On February 22, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-0482h: AA VV 02/22/2024 HJ 6 P. 133
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0482h: MA DV 356-10 02/22/2024 HJ 6 P. 133
On February 9, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0482h (NT) 02/06/2024 (Vote 20-0; RC)
On January 31, 2024 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/06/2024 01:00 pm LOB 302-304
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/06/2024 09:00 am LOB 302-304
On January 22, 2024 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/30/2024 03:00 pm LOB 302-304
- Full Committee Work Session: 01/30/2024 01:30 pm LOB 302-304
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/09/2024 09:30 am LOB 302-304
- ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 01/22/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy HJ 1 P. 30